House
|
04/09/2025
|
Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/14/2025
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2025
|
Sponsor(s) Added.
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Placed behind the budget
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/26/2025
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 3/19/2025
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2025
|
Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State & Local Government Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2025
|
Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/11/2025
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2025
|
Action Def. in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee to 3/11/2025
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2025
|
Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/4/2025
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2025
|
Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2025
|
Ref. to State & Local Government Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2025
|
P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2025
|
Intro., P1C.
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
Filed for introduction
|
|
|