House | 04/16/2025 | Comp. SB subst. | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar 4/16/2025 | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Objected to on Consent Calendar. | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/14/2025 | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/10/2025 | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 4/9/2025 | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Action def. in Judiciary Committee to 4/9/2025 | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 4/2/2025 | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Action def. in Judiciary Committee to 4/02/2025 | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 3/26/2025 | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/19/2025 | ||
House | 02/11/2025 | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/10/2025 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2025 | Intro., P1C. | ||
House | 02/05/2025 | Filed for introduction |