House | 03/12/2025 | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee of State & Local Government Committee | ||
House | 03/10/2025 | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 3/12/2025 | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 3/12/2025 | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Action def. in State & Local Government Committee to 3/12/2025 | ||
House | 02/26/2025 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 3/5/2025 | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 2/19/2025 | ||
House | 02/11/2025 | Assigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/10/2025 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2025 | Intro., P1C. | ||
House | 02/05/2025 | Filed for introduction |