House | 03/18/2025 | Action Def. in s/c Tenncare Subcommittee to First Calendar of 2026 | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Placed on s/c cal Tenncare Subcommittee for 3/18/2025 | ||
House | 03/06/2025 | Sponsor(s) Added. | ||
House | 02/11/2025 | Assigned to s/c Tenncare Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/10/2025 | P2C, ref. to Insurance Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2025 | Intro., P1C. | ||
House | 02/05/2025 | Filed for introduction |