House | 03/04/2025 | Def. to Summer Study in Population Health Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/26/2025 | Placed on s/c cal Population Health Subcommittee for 3/4/2025 | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | Action Def. in s/c Population Health Subcommittee to 3/4/2025 | ||
House | 02/19/2025 | Placed on s/c cal Population Health Subcommittee for 2/25/2025 | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | Assigned to s/c Population Health Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | P2C, ref. to Health Committee | ||
House | 02/10/2025 | Intro., P1C. | ||
House | 02/06/2025 | Filed for introduction |