Senate | 03/13/2025 | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | ||
House | 03/10/2025 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 69, Nays 23, PNV 1 | ||
House | 03/10/2025 | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0034) | ||
House | 03/10/2025 | Sponsor(s) Added. | ||
House | 03/06/2025 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/10/2025 | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/6/2025 | ||
House | 03/04/2025 | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/26/2025 | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/4/2025 | ||
House | 02/19/2025 | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/19/2025 | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | P2C, ref. to Health Committee | ||
House | 02/10/2025 | Intro., P1C. | ||
House | 02/06/2025 | Filed for introduction |