House | 03/26/2025 | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 4/2/2025 | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/26/2025 | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to the Gun Calendar | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/19/2025 | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Ref. to Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. | ||
House | 02/10/2025 | Intro., P1C. | ||
House | 02/06/2025 | Filed for introduction |