04/30/2025 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 181 | |||
House | 03/31/2025 | Comp. SB subst. | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/31/2025 | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/27/2025 | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 3/26/2025 | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Action def. in State & Local Government Committee to 3/26/2025 | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 3/19/2025 | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State & Local Government Committee | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/11/2025 | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Ref. to State & Local Government Committee | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. | ||
House | 02/10/2025 | Intro., P1C. | ||
House | 02/10/2025 | Sponsor change. | ||
House | 02/10/2025 | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. | ||
House | 02/06/2025 | Filed for introduction |