House | 04/29/2025 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Signed by Senate Speaker | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Signed by H. Speaker | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Sponsor(s) Added. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Concurred, Ayes 33, Nays 0 | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 3 for 4/22/2025 | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee | ||
House | 04/21/2025 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | ||
House | 04/21/2025 | Adopted, Ayes 86, Nays 0, PNV 1 | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. 4/21/2025 | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Filed for introduction |