|
04/08/2025
|
Effective date(s) 03/25/2025
|
|
|
|
04/08/2025
|
Pub. Ch. 64
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2025
|
Signed by Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2025
|
Transmitted to Governor for action.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
Signed by H. Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
Signed by Senate Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2025
|
Enrolled and ready for signatures
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2025
|
Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2025
|
Subst. for comp. HB.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2025
|
Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2025
|
Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/3/2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2025
|
Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2025
|
Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 2/26/2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2025
|
Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2025
|
Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2025
|
Filed for introduction
|
|
|