Tennessee 2025-2026 Regular Session

Tennessee Senate Bill SB0654 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11
2-HOUSE BILL 717
3- By Jones R
2+<BillNo> <Sponsor>
43
54 SENATE BILL 654
65 By Crowe
76
87
98 SB0654
109 002698
1110 - 1 -
1211
1312 AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 9;
1413 Title 33; Title 52; Title 67 and Title 68, relative to
1514 relief for caregivers of individuals with Alzheimer's
1615 disease or related dementia.
1716
1817 WHEREAS, one in three senior citizens will die from dementia; and
1918 WHEREAS, the caregivers of family members with Alzheimer's disease incur
2019 replacement costs and forgone wages estimated to be $36,667 per person; and
2120 WHEREAS, financial relief is positively related to the level of service and support
2221 provided by informal caregivers; and
2322 WHEREAS, it is fitting and proper that the state create a financial relief program to
2423 benefit Alzheimer's caregivers; now, therefore,
2524 BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF TENNESSEE:
2625 SECTION 1. Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 52, is amended by adding the following
2726 as a new chapter:
2827 52-9-101. This chapter is known and may be cited as the "Caring for Caregivers Act."
2928 52-9-102. As used in this chapter:
3029 (1) "Activities of daily living" or "ADL" means:
3130 (A) Ambulating, which is the extent of an individual's ability to move from
3231 one position to another and walk independently;
3332 (B) Feeding, which is the ability of an individual to feed oneself;
3433 (C) Dressing, which is the ability to select appropriate clothes and to put
3534 the clothes on without aid;
35+ (D) Personal hygiene, which is the ability to bathe and groom oneself and
36+maintain dental hygiene and nail and hair care;
3637
3738
3839 - 2 - 002698
3940
40- (D) Personal hygiene, which is the ability to bathe and groom oneself and
41-maintain dental hygiene and nail and hair care;
4241 (E) Continence, which is the ability to control bladder and bowel function;
4342 and
4443 (F) Toileting, which is the ability to get to and from the toilet without aid,
4544 using it appropriately, and cleaning oneself;
4645 (2) "Adjusted income" means household income minus fifty percent (50%) of the
4746 cost of total eligible expenditures for the year;
4847 (3) "Alzheimer's disease or related dementia" has the same meaning as defined
4948 in § 52-8-203;
5049 (4) "Eligible expenditures":
5150 (A) Means uncompensated expenses paid or incurred by a family
5251 caregiver that are directly related to assisting the family caregiver in providing
5352 care to an eligible family member;
5453 (B) Includes expenses paid or incurred for:
5554 (i) The improvement or alteration to the family caregiver's or
5655 eligible family member's primary residence to permit the eligible family
5756 member to live in the residence and to remain mobile, safe, and
5857 independent;
5958 (ii) The family caregiver's purchase or lease of equipment,
6059 including healthcare equipment, durable medical equipment, or
6160 technology, that is necessary to assist an eligible family member in
6261 carrying out one (1) or more ADLs; or
6362 (iii) Respite care; and
63+(C) Does not include the carrying out of general household maintenance
64+activities such as painting, plumbing, electrical repairs, or exterior maintenance;
65+ (5) "Eligible family member" means an individual who:
6466
6567
6668 - 3 - 002698
6769
68-(C) Does not include the carrying out of general household maintenance
69-activities such as painting, plumbing, electrical repairs, or exterior maintenance;
70- (5) "Eligible family member" means an individual who:
7170 (A) Requires assistance with at least two (2) ADLs and is diagnosed with
7271 Alzheimer's disease or related dementia and qualifies as an adult child, spouse,
7372 parent, or other relative by blood or marriage to a family caregiver; and
7473 (B) Lives in a private residential home and not in an assisted living
7574 center, nursing facility, or residential care home;
7675 (6) "Family caregiver" means an individual who:
7776 (A) Provides care and support for an eligible family member;
7877 (B) Has incurred eligible expenditures; and
7978 (C) For calendar year 2026, and each subsequent year, has an annual
8079 adjusted income from all sources that does not exceed thirty-seven thousand
8180 dollars ($37,000); and
8281 (7) "Respite care" has the same meaning as defined in § 52-8-203.
8382 52-9-103.
8483 (a) The department shall establish and administer a family caregiver grant pilot
8584 program to provide grants to family caregivers of eligible family members in each of the
8685 three (3) grand divisions to offset eligible expenditures incurred by the family caregivers.
8786 The pilot program must be operated from July 1, 2025, to December 31, 2028.
8887 (b) There is created a separate fund within the general fund to be known as the
8988 family caregiver grant fund. The fund is composed of:
9089 (1) Funds appropriated by the general assembly for the fund; and
9190 (2) Gifts, grants, and other donations received by the department for the
9291 fund.
92+(c) Subject to the availability of funds, the department shall allocate and disperse
93+grants each fiscal year of the pilot program period to family caregivers of eligible family
9394
9495
9596 - 4 - 002698
9697
97-(c) Subject to the availability of funds, the department shall allocate and disperse
98-grants each fiscal year of the pilot program period to family caregivers of eligible family
9998 members on a first-come, first-served basis. A grant awarded under this chapter is
10099 limited to six thousand dollars ($6,000) per family caregiver in a fiscal year.
101100 (d) Family caregivers must continue to qualify for a grant while the eligible family
102101 member is temporarily relocated for health care to a hospital or skilled or intermediate
103102 care facility if the eligible family member indicates an intent to return to the private
104103 residential home when recovered sufficiently.
105104 (e) It is the legislative intent that an initial appropriation in the amount of six
106105 hundred thousand dollars ($600,000) be appropriated in fiscal year 2025-2026 in the
107106 general appropriations act for awarding grants from the fund.
108107 (f) Moneys in the fund must be invested by the state treasurer for the benefit of
109108 the fund in accordance with § 9-4-603. Interest accruing on investments and deposits of
110109 the fund must be returned to the fund and remain part of the fund. Any unencumbered
111110 moneys and any unexpended balance of the fund remaining at the end of a fiscal year
112111 do not revert to the general fund, but must be carried forward until expended in
113112 accordance with this section.
114113 52-9-104. The annual adjusted income limit in § 52-9-103(6)(C) must be adjusted by the
115114 department on July 1, 2026, and July 1, 2027, to reflect the cost-of-living adjustment for social
116115 security recipients as determined by the social security administration and must be rounded to
117116 the nearest ten dollars ($10.00). The income attributable to the family caregiver applying for a
118117 grant is the income of the family caregiver and the income of the family caregiver's spouse, if
119118 applicable.
120119 52-9-105. The commissioner may promulgate rules to effectuate this chapter in
121120 accordance with the Uniform Administrative Procedures Act, compiled in title 4, chapter 5.
121+52-9-106. On or before October 1, 2026, and by October 1 of each subsequent year,
122+until the close of the pilot program period, the department shall submit a report to the chair of
122123
123124
124125 - 5 - 002698
125126
126-52-9-106. On or before October 1, 2026, and by October 1 of each subsequent year,
127-until the close of the pilot program period, the department shall submit a report to the chair of
128127 the health and welfare committee of the senate and the chair of the committee in the house of
129128 representatives having jurisdiction over health-related matters on the status of the program and
130129 on the funds received and payments made by the family caregiver grant fund.
131130 SECTION 2. This act is not an appropriation of funds, and funds must not be obligated
132131 or expended pursuant to this act unless the funds are specifically appropriated by the general
133132 appropriations act.
134133 SECTION 3. This act takes effect upon becoming a law, the public welfare requiring it.