House | 04/10/2025 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Sponsor(s) Added. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Passed Senate, Ayes 24, Nays 5 | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/9/2025 | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee | ||
Senate | 03/19/2025 | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/25/2025 | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/25/2025 | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/18/2025 | ||
Senate | 02/12/2025 | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee | ||
Senate | 02/10/2025 | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration | ||
Senate | 01/31/2025 | Filed for introduction |