04/30/2025 | Effective date(s) 04/11/2025 | |||
04/30/2025 | Pub. Ch. 176 | |||
Senate | 04/11/2025 | Signed by Governor. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Transmitted to Governor for action. | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Signed by H. Speaker | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Signed by Senate Speaker | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 2 | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Subst. for comp. HB. | ||
House | 03/03/2025 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | ||
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 2/27/2025 | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee | ||
Senate | 02/18/2025 | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/25/2025 | ||
Senate | 02/12/2025 | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee | ||
Senate | 02/10/2025 | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration | ||
Senate | 02/04/2025 | Filed for introduction |