Senate | 03/10/2025 | Adopted, Ayes 30, Nays 0 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2025 | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/10/2025 | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | Recommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/4/2025 | ||
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee | ||
Senate | 02/12/2025 | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration | ||
Senate | 02/10/2025 | Filed for introduction |