Senate | 04/29/2025 | Transmitted to Governor for action. | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Signed by H. Speaker | ||
Senate | 04/25/2025 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Sponsor(s) Added. | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Concurred, Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 4 | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | SJR placed on H. consent cal. 4 for 4/22/2025 | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Adopted, Ayes 33, Nays 0 | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 3 for 4/22/2025 | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Refer to Senate Calendar Committee | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Filed for introduction |