Senate | 04/29/2025 | Transmitted to Governor for action. | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Signed by H. Speaker | ||
Senate | 04/25/2025 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | ||
Senate | 04/25/2025 | Signed by Senate Speaker | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | R/S Concurred, v.v. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0 | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 4 for 4/22/2025 | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Refer to Senate Calendar Committee | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Filed for introduction |