Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1041 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.B. No. 1041


 AN ACT
 relating to school district policies addressing sexual abuse of
 children and establishment of a state strategy to reduce child
 abuse and neglect and improve child welfare.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. This Act shall be known as Jenna's Law.
 SECTION 2. Subchapter A, Chapter 38, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 38.0041 to read as follows:
 Sec. 38.0041.  POLICIES ADDRESSING SEXUAL ABUSE OF CHILDREN.
 (a) Each school district shall adopt and implement a policy
 addressing sexual abuse of children to be included in the district
 improvement plan under Section 11.252 and any informational
 handbook provided to students and parents.
 (b) A policy required by this section must address:
 (1)  methods for increasing teacher, student, and
 parent awareness of issues regarding sexual abuse of children,
 including knowledge of likely warning signs indicating that a child
 may be a victim of sexual abuse, using resources developed by the
 agency under Section 38.004;
 (2)  actions that a child who is a victim of sexual
 abuse should take to obtain assistance and intervention; and
 (3)  available counseling options for students
 affected by sexual abuse.
 SECTION 3. (a) In this section, "task force" means the task
 force established under this section to establish a strategy for
 reducing child abuse and neglect and improving child welfare.
 (b) The task force consists of nine members appointed as
 follows:
 (1) five members appointed by the governor;
 (2) two members appointed by the lieutenant governor;
 and
 (3) two members appointed by the speaker of the house
 of representatives.
 (c) Members of the task force must be individuals who are
 actively involved in the fields of the prevention of child abuse and
 neglect and child welfare. The appointment of members must reflect
 the geographic diversity of the state.
 (d) The task force shall elect a presiding officer by a
 majority vote of the membership of the task force.
 (e) The task force shall meet at the call of the presiding
 officer.
 (f) Chapter 2110, Government Code, does not apply to the
 task force.
 (g) The task force shall establish a strategy for reducing
 child abuse and neglect and for improving child welfare in this
 state. In establishing that strategy, the task force shall:
 (1) gather information concerning child safety, child
 abuse and neglect, and child welfare throughout the state;
 (2) review the exemptions from criminal liability
 provided under the Penal Code to a mother who injures her unborn
 child by using a controlled substance, as defined by Chapter 481,
 Health and Safety Code, other than a controlled substance legally
 obtained by prescription, during her pregnancy and examine the
 effect that repealing the exemptions will have on reducing the
 number of babies who are born addicted to a controlled substance;
 (3) receive reports and testimony from individuals,
 state and local agencies, community-based organizations, and other
 public and private organizations;
 (4) create goals for state policy that would improve
 child safety, prevent child abuse and neglect, and improve child
 welfare; and
 (5) submit a strategic plan to accomplish those goals.
 (h) The strategic plan submitted under Subsection (g) of
 this section may include proposals for specific statutory changes,
 the creation of new programs, and methods to foster cooperation
 among state agencies and between the state and local government.
 (i) The task force shall consult with employees of the
 Department of Family and Protective Services, the Department of
 State Health Services, and the Texas Department of Criminal Justice
 as necessary to accomplish the task force's responsibilities under
 this Act.
 (j) The task force may cooperate as necessary with any other
 appropriate state agency.
 (k) The governor, lieutenant governor, and speaker of the
 house of representatives shall appoint the members of the task
 force not later than October 1, 2009.
 (l) Not later than November 1, 2010, the task force shall
 submit the strategic plan required by Subsection (g) of this
 section to the governor, lieutenant governor, and speaker of the
 house of representatives.
 (m) The task force is abolished and this section expires on
 September 1, 2011.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1041 was passed by the House on May 7,
 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 1041 on May 29, 2009, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 1041 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 145,
 Nays 0, 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1041 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 25, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 1041 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor