E
|
05/23/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/23/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4641
|
E
|
05/14/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3802
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2370
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3673
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3802
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3207
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2231
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2231
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2231
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2231
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2231
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2231
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2231
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1997
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2009
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1481
|
Senate
|
04/24/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1481
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1375
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1772
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1683
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#223
|
Journal Page: 1683
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1683
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1683
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1668
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1668
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1570
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2009
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 412
|
House
|
02/24/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 412
|
House
|
02/04/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|