E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6978
|
E
|
05/26/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5164
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2913
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4818
|
House
|
05/25/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4992
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2893
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4524
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4525
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1097
|
Journal Page: 4525
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4524
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4311
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2645
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2645
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2645
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2645
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2645
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2645
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2645
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2511
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 1931
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1931
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1374
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1772
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#229
|
Journal Page: 1693
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1693
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1692
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1630
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Phillips
|
Journal Page: 1629
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1629
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1123
|
House
|
03/11/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 485
|
House
|
03/02/2009
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2009
|
Subcommittee members named
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2009
|
Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 275
|
House
|
02/12/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 275
|
House
|
11/10/2008
|
Filed
|
|
|