1 | 1 | | By: Hochberg (Senate Sponsor - Ellis) H.B. No. 1117 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2009; |
---|
3 | 3 | | May 14, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on State |
---|
4 | 4 | | Affairs; May 23, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
5 | 5 | | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 1; |
---|
6 | 6 | | May 23, 2009, sent to printer.) |
---|
7 | 7 | | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1117 By: Van de Putte |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | |
---|
10 | 10 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
11 | 11 | | AN ACT |
---|
12 | 12 | | relating to ballot instructions. |
---|
13 | 13 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
14 | 14 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 52, Election Code, is |
---|
15 | 15 | | amended by adding Section 52.0695 to read as follows: |
---|
16 | 16 | | Sec. 52.0695. GENERAL BALLOT INSTRUCTION. (a) In addition |
---|
17 | 17 | | to any other required ballot instructions, a ballot must contain an |
---|
18 | 18 | | instruction that clearly and unambiguously describes how to cast a |
---|
19 | 19 | | ballot using the voting equipment on which the voter's ballot will |
---|
20 | 20 | | be cast and includes an explanation of actions by the voter that may |
---|
21 | 21 | | change or otherwise affect a prior selection by the voter. An |
---|
22 | 22 | | instruction required by this subsection must describe the effect of |
---|
23 | 23 | | not properly marking a paper ballot, if a paper ballot is used. |
---|
24 | 24 | | (b) The secretary of state shall determine when the |
---|
25 | 25 | | instruction described by Subsection (a) is necessary and by rule |
---|
26 | 26 | | shall prescribe the specific instruction to be included on a ballot |
---|
27 | 27 | | under this section. |
---|
28 | 28 | | (c) Failure to comply with this section is not grounds for a |
---|
29 | 29 | | civil action or an action or contest challenging the validity or |
---|
30 | 30 | | result of an election in which the ballot instruction required by |
---|
31 | 31 | | this section was not given to one or more voters. |
---|
32 | 32 | | SECTION 2. Section 52.071, Election Code, is amended by |
---|
33 | 33 | | adding Subsections (c) and (d) to read as follows: |
---|
34 | 34 | | (c) An instruction under this section shall also describe: |
---|
35 | 35 | | (1) the effect of a straight-party vote if the vote |
---|
36 | 36 | | would not apply to all elections on the ballot; and |
---|
37 | 37 | | (2) any circumstances under which casting a vote for |
---|
38 | 38 | | an individual candidate will negate a straight-party vote or |
---|
39 | 39 | | otherwise cause a vote for a nominee of the same party to not be |
---|
40 | 40 | | recorded or counted. |
---|
41 | 41 | | (d) The secretary of state shall by rule prescribe the |
---|
42 | 42 | | specific instructions to be included under Subsection (c). Failure |
---|
43 | 43 | | to comply with Subsection (c) is not grounds for a civil action or |
---|
44 | 44 | | an action or contest challenging the validity or result of an |
---|
45 | 45 | | election in which the ballot instruction described by Subsection |
---|
46 | 46 | | (c) was not given to one or more voters. |
---|
47 | 47 | | SECTION 3. Subchapter A, Chapter 124, Election Code, is |
---|
48 | 48 | | amended by adding Section 124.007 to read as follows: |
---|
49 | 49 | | Sec. 124.007. WARNING FOR CERTAIN VOTING ACTIONS. (a) |
---|
50 | 50 | | Where practicable, electronic voting systems shall provide for a |
---|
51 | 51 | | clearly worded warning to appear if a voter attempts to cast a vote, |
---|
52 | 52 | | make a selection, or take another related action that could cancel a |
---|
53 | 53 | | prior selection, change a prior selection, or cancel or change a |
---|
54 | 54 | | straight-party selection made by the voter. |
---|
55 | 55 | | (b) The secretary of state shall determine when the warning |
---|
56 | 56 | | described by Subsection (a) is necessary and shall by rule |
---|
57 | 57 | | prescribe warning language for each voting system approved for use |
---|
58 | 58 | | in the state. |
---|
59 | 59 | | (c) Failure to comply with this section is not grounds for a |
---|
60 | 60 | | civil action or an action or contest challenging the validity or |
---|
61 | 61 | | result of an election in which the warning required by this section |
---|
62 | 62 | | was not given to one or more voters. |
---|
63 | 63 | | SECTION 4. The changes in law made by this Act apply only to |
---|
64 | 64 | | an election held on or after January 1, 2010. An election held |
---|
65 | 65 | | before January 1, 2010, is governed by the law in effect when the |
---|
66 | 66 | | election is held, and the former law is continued in effect for that |
---|
67 | 67 | | purpose. |
---|
68 | 68 | | SECTION 5. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
69 | 69 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
70 | 70 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
71 | 71 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
72 | 72 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
73 | 73 | | * * * * * |
---|