Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1138 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    H.B. No. 1138


 AN ACT
 relating to information required on pharmacy benefit cards.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 1369.151, Insurance Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 1369.151. APPLICABILITY OF SUBCHAPTER. (a) This
 subchapter applies only to a health benefit plan that provides
 benefits for medical or surgical expenses incurred as a result of a
 health condition, accident, or sickness, including an individual,
 group, blanket, or franchise insurance policy or insurance
 agreement, a group hospital service contract, or an individual or
 group evidence of coverage or similar coverage document that is
 offered by:
 (1) an insurance company;
 (2) a group hospital service corporation operating
 under Chapter 842;
 (3) a fraternal benefit society operating under
 Chapter 885;
 (4) a stipulated premium company operating under
 Chapter 884;
 (5) a reciprocal exchange operating under Chapter 942;
 (6) a health maintenance organization operating under
 Chapter 843;
 (7) a multiple employer welfare arrangement that holds
 a certificate of authority under Chapter 846; or
 (8) an approved nonprofit health corporation that
 holds a certificate of authority under Chapter 844.
 (b)  Notwithstanding any other law, this subchapter applies
 to coverage under:
 (1) the basic coverage plan under Chapter 1551;
 (2) the basic plan under Chapter 1575;
 (3) the primary care coverage plan under Chapter 1579;
 (4) the basic coverage plan under Chapter 1601;
 (5)  the child health plan program under Chapter 62,
 Health and Safety Code; and
 (6)  the medical assistance program under Chapter 32,
 Human Resources Code.
 SECTION 2. Section 1369.153, Insurance Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 1369.153. INFORMATION REQUIRED ON IDENTIFICATION
 CARD. (a) An issuer of a health benefit plan that provides
 pharmacy benefits to enrollees shall include on the front of the
 identification card of each enrollee:
 (1) the name [or logo] of the entity administering the
 pharmacy benefits if the entity is different from the health
 benefit plan issuer;
 (2) the group number applicable to the enrollee;
 (3)  the identification number of the enrollee, which
 may not be the enrollee's social security number;
 (4)  the bank identification number necessary for
 electronic billing;
 (5) [(3)] the effective date of the coverage evidenced
 by the card; and
 (6) [(4)     a telephone number for contacting an
 appropriate person to obtain information relating to the pharmacy
 benefits provided under the plan; and
 [(5)] copayment information for generic and
 brand-name prescription drugs.
 (b) In addition to the information required under
 Subsection (a), the issuer of a health benefit plan shall include on
 the identification card of each enrollee:
 (1)  the logo of the entity administering the pharmacy
 benefits if the entity is different from the health benefit plan
 issuer; and
 (2)  a telephone number for contacting an appropriate
 person to obtain information relating to the pharmacy benefits
 provided under the plan.
 (c)  In addition to complying with Subsections (a) and (b),
 an issuer of a health benefit plan may provide the information
 required under Subsections (a) and (b) in electronically readable
 form on the back of the identification card.
 (d) This section does not require a health benefit plan
 issuer that administers its own pharmacy benefits to issue an
 identification card separate from any identification card issued to
 an enrollee to evidence coverage under the plan if the
 identification card issued to evidence coverage contains the
 information required by Subsections [Subsection] (a) and (b).
 SECTION 3. Section 1369.154, Insurance Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 1369.154. RULES. (a) The commissioner shall adopt
 rules as necessary to implement this subchapter.
 (b)  Rules adopted by the commissioner must be consistent
 with national standards established by the Workgroup for Electronic
 Data Interchange or by other similar organizations recognized by
 the commissioner.
 SECTION 4. This Act applies only to an insurance policy or
 contract or evidence of coverage that is delivered, issued for
 delivery, or renewed on or after January 1, 2010. An insurance
 policy or contract or evidence of coverage delivered, issued for
 delivery, or renewed before January 1, 2010, is governed by the law
 as it existed immediately before the effective date of this Act, and
 that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1138 was passed by the House on May 5,
 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 1138 on May 29, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 140, Nays 0,
 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1138 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 26, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor