Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1145 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.B. No. 1145


 AN ACT
 relating to the appointment of election judges.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Sections 32.002(a), (b), and (c), Election Code,
 are amended to read as follows:
 (a) The commissioners court [at its July term] shall appoint
 the election judges for each regular county election precinct:
 (1)  at its July term in a county with a population of
 over 500,000; or
 (2)  at its August term in a county with a population of
 500,000 or less.
 (b) Judges appointed under Subsection (a) serve for a term
 of one year [beginning on August 1 following the appointment],
 except that the commissioners court by order recorded in its
 minutes may provide for a term of two years. A judge's term begins:
 (1)  August 1 following appointment in a county to
 which Subsection (a)(1) applies; or
 (2)  September 1 following appointment in a county to
 which Subsection (a)(2) applies.
 (c) The presiding judge and alternate presiding judge must
 be affiliated or aligned with different political parties, subject
 to this subsection. Before July of each year in a county to which
 Subsection (a)(1) applies or before August of each year in a county
 to which Subsection (a)(2) applies, the county chair of a political
 party whose candidate for governor received the highest or second
 highest number of votes in the county in the most recent
 gubernatorial general election shall submit in writing to the
 commissioners court a list of names of persons in order of
 preference for each precinct who are eligible for appointment as an
 election judge. The county chair may supplement the list of names
 of persons until the 20th day before a general election or the 15th
 day before a special election in case an appointed election judge
 becomes unable to serve. The commissioners court shall appoint the
 first person meeting the applicable eligibility requirements from
 the list submitted in compliance with this subsection by the party
 with the highest number of votes in the precinct as the presiding
 judge and the first person meeting the applicable eligibility
 requirements from the list submitted in compliance with this
 subsection by the party with the second highest number of votes in
 the precinct as the alternate presiding judge. The commissioners
 court may reject the list if the persons whose names are submitted
 on the list are determined not to meet the applicable eligibility
 requirements.
 SECTION 2. The term of an election judge serving on the
 effective date of this Act expires:
 (1) September 1, 2010, if the judge serves in a county
 with a population of 500,000 or less and the judge's term would
 expire August 1, 2010, under Section 32.002(b), Election Code, as
 that section existed before amendment by this Act;
 (2) August 1, 2010, if the judge serves in a county
 with a population of over 500,000 and the judge's term would expire
 August 1, 2010, under Section 32.002(b), Election Code, as that
 section existed before amendment by this Act;
 (3) September 1, 2011, if the judge serves in a county
 with a population of 500,000 or less and the judge's term would
 expire August 1, 2011, under Section 32.002(b), Election Code, as
 that section existed before amendment by this Act; or
 (4) August 1, 2011, if the judge serves in a county
 with a population of over 500,000 and the judge's term would expire
 August 1, 2011, under Section 32.002(b), Election Code, as that
 section existed before amendment by this Act.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect January 1, 2010.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1145 was passed by the House on April
 9, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 148, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1145 was passed by the Senate on May
 26, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: _____________________
 Date
 _____________________
 Governor