Senate | 05/12/2009 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 2301 | |
Senate | 05/12/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2301 | |
Senate | 04/06/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 888 | |
House | 04/03/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1093 | |
House | 04/02/2009 | Record vote | RV#93 | Journal Page: 1046 |
House | 04/02/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1046 | |
House | 04/02/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1046 | |
House | 04/01/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1027 | |
House | 04/01/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1027 | |
House | 04/01/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/27/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 989 | |
House | 03/16/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/16/2009 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 03/16/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Subcommittee members named | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Referred to subcommittee | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/25/2009 | Referred to Business & Industry | Journal Page: 431 | |
House | 02/25/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 431 | |
House | 02/10/2009 | Filed |