House | 05/11/2009 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3099 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 526 | Journal Page: 3099 |
House | 05/11/2009 | Postponed | 5/11/09 1:50 PM | Journal Page: 3077 |
House | 05/11/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3077 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Postponed | 5/11/09 7:05 AM | Journal Page: 3001 |
House | 05/08/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3001 | |
House | 05/06/2009 | Postponed | 5/8/09 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2615 |
House | 05/06/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2615 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Postponed | 5/6/09 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2481 |
House | 05/05/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2481 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Postponed | 5/5/09 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2240 |
House | 05/01/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2240 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1570 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/26/2009 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 464 | |
House | 02/26/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 464 | |
House | 02/10/2009 | Filed |