Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1170 Latest Draft

Bill / House Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            81R28003 JMM-F
 By: Martinez H.B. No. 1170
 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 1170:
 By: Rose C.S.H.B. No. 1170


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the qualifications to conduct a social study in certain
 suits affecting the parent-child relationship.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 107.0511, Family Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (g), (h), and (i) to read as follows:
 (g)  The minimum qualifications prescribed by this section
 do not apply to an individual who, before September 1, 2007:
 (1)  lived in a county that has a population of 500,000
 or more and is adjacent to two or more counties each of which has a
 population of 50,000 or more;
 (2)  received a four-year degree from an accredited
 institution of higher education;
 (3)  worked as a child protective services investigator
 for the Department of Family and Protective Services for at least
 four years;
 (4)  worked as a community supervision and corrections
 department officer; and
 (5)  conducted at least 100 social studies in the
 previous five years.
 (h)  A person described by Subsection (g) who performs a
 social study must:
 (1)  complete at least eight hours of family violence
 dynamics training provided by a family violence service provider;
 and
 (2)  participate annually in at least 15 hours of
 continuing education for child custody evaluators that meets the
 Model Standards of Practice for Child Custody Evaluation adopted
 by the Association of Family and Conciliation Courts as those
 standards existed May 1, 2009, or a later version of those standards
 if adopted by rule of the executive commissioner of the Health and
 Human Services Commission.
 (i)  Subsections (g) and (h) and this subsection expire
 September 1, 2017.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.