Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1172 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 81R5394 JD-D
22 By: Martinez H.B. No. 1172
33
44
55 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
66 AN ACT
77 relating to an exemption from ad valorem taxation of the residence
88 homesteads of certain partially disabled veterans.
99 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1010 SECTION 1. Section 11.13, Tax Code, is amended by adding
1111 Subsection (t) to read as follows:
1212 (t) For purposes of this subsection, "disability rating"
1313 and "disabled veteran" have the meanings assigned by Section 11.22.
1414 A disabled veteran who has a disability rating of less than 100
1515 percent is entitled to an exemption from taxation of a percentage of
1616 the appraised value of the disabled veteran's residence homestead
1717 equal to the disabled veteran's disability rating.
1818 SECTION 2. Section 403.302(d), Government Code, is amended
1919 to read as follows:
2020 (d) For the purposes of this section, "taxable value" means
2121 the market value of all taxable property less:
2222 (1) the total dollar amount of any residence homestead
2323 exemptions lawfully granted under Section 11.13(b), [or] (c), or
2424 (t), Tax Code, in the year that is the subject of the study for each
2525 school district;
2626 (2) one-half of the total dollar amount of any
2727 residence homestead exemptions granted under Section 11.13(n), Tax
2828 Code, in the year that is the subject of the study for each school
2929 district;
3030 (3) the total dollar amount of any exemptions granted
3131 before May 31, 1993, within a reinvestment zone under agreements
3232 authorized by Chapter 312, Tax Code;
3333 (4) subject to Subsection (e), the total dollar amount
3434 of any captured appraised value of property that:
3535 (A) is within a reinvestment zone created on or
3636 before May 31, 1999, or is proposed to be included within the
3737 boundaries of a reinvestment zone as the boundaries of the zone and
3838 the proposed portion of tax increment paid into the tax increment
3939 fund by a school district are described in a written notification
4040 provided by the municipality or the board of directors of the zone
4141 to the governing bodies of the other taxing units in the manner
4242 provided by Section 311.003(e), Tax Code, before May 31, 1999, and
4343 within the boundaries of the zone as those boundaries existed on
4444 September 1, 1999, including subsequent improvements to the
4545 property regardless of when made;
4646 (B) generates taxes paid into a tax increment
4747 fund created under Chapter 311, Tax Code, under a reinvestment zone
4848 financing plan approved under Section 311.011(d), Tax Code, on or
4949 before September 1, 1999; and
5050 (C) is eligible for tax increment financing under
5151 Chapter 311, Tax Code;
5252 (5) for a school district for which a deduction from
5353 taxable value is made under Subdivision (4), an amount equal to the
5454 taxable value required to generate revenue when taxed at the school
5555 district's current tax rate in an amount that, when added to the
5656 taxes of the district paid into a tax increment fund as described by
5757 Subdivision (4)(B), is equal to the total amount of taxes the
5858 district would have paid into the tax increment fund if the district
5959 levied taxes at the rate the district levied in 2005;
6060 (6) the total dollar amount of any captured appraised
6161 value of property that:
6262 (A) is within a reinvestment zone:
6363 (i) created on or before December 31, 2008,
6464 by a municipality with a population of less than 18,000; and
6565 (ii) the project plan for which includes
6666 the alteration, remodeling, repair, or reconstruction of a
6767 structure that is included on the National Register of Historic
6868 Places and requires that a portion of the tax increment of the zone
6969 be used for the improvement or construction of related facilities
7070 or for affordable housing;
7171 (B) generates school district taxes that are paid
7272 into a tax increment fund created under Chapter 311, Tax Code; and
7373 (C) is eligible for tax increment financing under
7474 Chapter 311, Tax Code;
7575 (7) the total dollar amount of any exemptions granted
7676 under Section 11.251 or 11.253, Tax Code;
7777 (8) the difference between the comptroller's estimate
7878 of the market value and the productivity value of land that
7979 qualifies for appraisal on the basis of its productive capacity,
8080 except that the productivity value estimated by the comptroller may
8181 not exceed the fair market value of the land;
8282 (9) the portion of the appraised value of residence
8383 homesteads of individuals who receive a tax limitation under
8484 Section 11.26, Tax Code, on which school district taxes are not
8585 imposed in the year that is the subject of the study, calculated as
8686 if the residence homesteads were appraised at the full value
8787 required by law;
8888 (10) a portion of the market value of property not
8989 otherwise fully taxable by the district at market value because of:
9090 (A) action required by statute or the
9191 constitution of this state that, if the tax rate adopted by the
9292 district is applied to it, produces an amount equal to the
9393 difference between the tax that the district would have imposed on
9494 the property if the property were fully taxable at market value and
9595 the tax that the district is actually authorized to impose on the
9696 property, if this subsection does not otherwise require that
9797 portion to be deducted; or
9898 (B) action taken by the district under Subchapter
9999 B or C, Chapter 313, Tax Code;
100100 (11) the market value of all tangible personal
101101 property, other than manufactured homes, owned by a family or
102102 individual and not held or used for the production of income;
103103 (12) the appraised value of property the collection of
104104 delinquent taxes on which is deferred under Section 33.06, Tax
105105 Code;
106106 (13) the portion of the appraised value of property
107107 the collection of delinquent taxes on which is deferred under
108108 Section 33.065, Tax Code; and
109109 (14) the amount by which the market value of a
110110 residence homestead to which Section 23.23, Tax Code, applies
111111 exceeds the appraised value of that property as calculated under
112112 that section.
113113 SECTION 3. This Act applies only to ad valorem taxes imposed
114114 for a tax year beginning on or after the effective date of this Act.
115115 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect January 1, 2010, but only
116116 if the constitutional amendment proposed by the 81st Legislature,
117117 Regular Session, 2009, authorizing the legislature to exempt a
118118 percentage of the market value of the residence homesteads of
119119 certain partially disabled veterans from ad valorem taxation is
120120 approved by the voters. If that amendment is not approved by the
121121 voters, this Act has no effect.