E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6978
|
E
|
06/01/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6976
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4986
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6027
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6903
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5199
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3342
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3342
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3342
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3342
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3342
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3342
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3342
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2714
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 2136
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2136
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2054
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2674
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2459
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#544
|
Journal Page: 2459
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2459
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2459
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2441
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2441
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1929
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2009
|
Referred to County Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 465
|
House
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 465
|
House
|
02/10/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|