E | 06/19/2009 | Effective on 9/1/09 | ||
E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6978 | |
E | 05/31/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6976 | |
Senate | 05/30/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 4680 | |
House | 05/29/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5976 | |
House | 05/29/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 6039 | |
House | 05/27/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 5126 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3500 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3500 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 3500 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 3500 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3500 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3500 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 3500 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/23/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/23/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/23/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2756 | |
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 2390 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2390 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2311 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3440 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Record vote | RV#749 | Journal Page: 3215 |
House | 05/12/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3215 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3215 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3187 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3187 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1570 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/26/2009 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 466 | |
House | 02/26/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 466 | |
House | 02/11/2009 | Filed |