E | 05/20/2009 | Effective on 1/1/10 | ||
E | 05/20/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 4316 | |
E | 05/12/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3441 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2197 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3171 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3302 | |
House | 05/07/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 2867 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2120 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2120 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2120 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2120 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2120 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2120 | |
Senate | 05/07/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2119 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2049 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 1413 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1413 | |
Senate | 04/23/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1375 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1772 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Record vote | RV#223 | Journal Page: 1683 |
House | 04/22/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1683 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1683 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1669 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1669 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1236 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/26/2009 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 466 | |
House | 02/26/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 466 | |
House | 02/11/2009 | Filed |