Senate | 05/19/2009 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 2564 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2564 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2455 | |
House | 05/17/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3954 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Record vote | RV#920 | Journal Page: 3780 |
House | 05/15/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3780 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3780 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3669 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Amended | 1-Darby | Journal Page: 3668 |
House | 05/14/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3668 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1014 | |
House | 03/23/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/23/2009 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 03/23/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Subcommittee members named | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Referred to subcommittee | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/26/2009 | Referred to Business & Industry | Journal Page: 467 | |
House | 02/26/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 467 | |
House | 02/11/2009 | Filed |