Senate | 04/27/2009 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1658 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1658 | |
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 996 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1207 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Record vote | RV#144 | Journal Page: 1173 |
House | 04/09/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1173 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1173 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1164 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1164 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 03/27/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 03/27/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 989 | |
House | 03/18/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/04/2009 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | ||
House | 02/26/2009 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 467 | |
House | 02/26/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 467 | |
House | 02/11/2009 | Filed |