Senate | 05/25/2009 | Tagged | ||
Senate | 05/25/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 2610 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2610 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2366 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3679 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3337 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Record vote | RV#806 | Journal Page: 3337 |
House | 05/13/2009 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 3337 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3337 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Postponed | 5/13/09 11:45 AM | Journal Page: 3326 |
House | 05/13/2009 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3326 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Amended | 2-S. Miller | Journal Page: 3320 |
House | 05/13/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3320 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3283 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Amendment fails of adoption | 2-P. King | Journal Page: 3279 |
House | 05/12/2009 | Amended | 1-C. Howard | Journal Page: 3278 |
House | 05/12/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3278 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1872 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/26/2009 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 468 | |
House | 02/26/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 468 | |
House | 02/12/2009 | Filed |