House | 05/07/2009 | Postponed | 6/1/15 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 2736 |
House | 05/07/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 2736 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Postponed | Journal Page: 2498 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2497 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/18/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1601 | |
House | 04/08/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/26/2009 | Referred to Energy Resources | Journal Page: 468 | |
House | 02/26/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 468 | |
House | 02/12/2009 | Filed |