Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1232 Compare Versions

The same version is selected twice. Please select two different versions to compare.
OldNewDifferences
11 H.B. No. 1232
22
33
44 AN ACT
55 relating to establishing a local behavioral health intervention
66 pilot project.
77 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
88 SECTION 1. (a) The Department of State Health Services
99 shall establish a local behavioral health intervention pilot
1010 project for children in Bexar County.
1111 (b) In implementing the pilot project, the department shall
1212 require a local mental health authority serving Bexar County to:
1313 (1) enter into a memorandum of understanding or other
1414 agreement with state and local agencies that work directly with
1515 children, including the Department of State Health Services, the
1616 Department of Family and Protective Services, the Texas Youth
1717 Commission, and the Texas Education Agency, to:
1818 (A) permit collaboration in the provision of
1919 uniform early intervention behavioral health services to children;
2020 (B) identify children, with written consent from
2121 parents or guardians, who are at risk of placement in an alternative
2222 setting for behavior management, in accordance with behavioral
2323 standards established by the Texas Education Agency and local
2424 school district policy, or intervention by the juvenile justice or
2525 child protective services systems; and
2626 (C) with written consent from parents or
2727 guardians, divert children identified under Paragraph (B) to a
2828 system of care services to reduce gaps or inefficiencies in the
2929 provision of care;
3030 (2) develop, in collaboration with the state and local
3131 agencies, a best practices plan regarding:
3232 (A) informed consent and confidentiality
3333 practices;
3434 (B) a consent form:
3535 (i) by which parents may give or refuse
3636 consent to share information with a specific agency or provider
3737 that collaborates in the provision of treatment or service to a
3838 child;
3939 (ii) that informs a parent that the parent
4040 has the right to withhold consent and may withdraw consent at any
4141 time; and
4242 (iii) that informs the parent of the type of
4343 information that an agency or provider may share if the parent
4444 consents;
4545 (C) uniform referral processes between systems
4646 and agencies related to behavioral health services;
4747 (D) the delivery of early intervention and
4848 treatment services;
4949 (E) an information exchange process between
5050 agencies to facilitate faster identification and assessment of
5151 behavioral health problems and integrate service delivery; and
5252 (F) an information exchange process between each
5353 parent of a child participating in the pilot project and the
5454 agencies and providers involved in the project to assist the parent
5555 in remaining informed regarding the evaluations performed in
5656 relation to the child and any conclusions or recommended treatment
5757 options resulting from those evaluations or decisions that need to
5858 be made by the parent as a result of an evaluation;
5959 (3) identify outcome measures that may be used to
6060 measure the efficiency of coordination;
6161 (4) ensure that an extensive listing of providers is
6262 available for children and their families, including information
6363 regarding the services offered and the behavioral health issues
6464 addressed by the provider; and
6565 (5) ensure that parents, agencies, and providers
6666 participating in the pilot project are informed that a parent or
6767 child may not be penalized for refusing to consent to the
6868 information sharing or services under the pilot project.
6969 (c) In order to facilitate the pilot project and identify
7070 children in accordance with Subsection (b)(1)(B), a local mental
7171 health authority serving Bexar County, the Department of State
7272 Health Services, the Department of Family and Protective Services,
7373 the Texas Youth Commission, the Texas Education Agency, and local
7474 school districts may, with the consent of the child's parents or
7575 guardians:
7676 (1) disclose information relating to a child,
7777 including information concerning the child's identity, needs,
7878 treatment, social, criminal, and educational history, probation or
7979 supervision status and compliance with the conditions of the
8080 child's probation or supervision, and medical or mental health
8181 history, if the disclosure serves a purpose of the pilot project;
8282 (2) accept information relating to a child that serves
8383 a purpose of the pilot project, regardless of whether other state
8484 law makes that information confidential; and
8585 (3) before sharing information under this section,
8686 enter into a memorandum of understanding with another local or
8787 state governmental entity to specify:
8888 (A) the types of information that may be
8989 exchanged among agencies under this section without violating any
9090 applicable provisions of federal law, including any federal funding
9191 requirements; and
9292 (B) the protocols for information sharing,
9393 including methods for ensuring the continued protection of
9494 confidential information by the recipient of the information.
9595 (d) This section does not affect the confidential status of
9696 the information being shared.
9797 (e) The department may use funds for crisis prevention
9898 programs in collaboration with funds from local authorities,
9999 including school districts and criminal justice agencies, to
100100 implement the pilot project.
101101 (f) Not later than December 1, 2010, the local mental health
102102 authority involved in the pilot project shall submit a report to the
103103 department regarding the local behavioral health intervention
104104 pilot project, including:
105105 (1) a comprehensive analysis of the efficacy of the
106106 project; and
107107 (2) the local authority's findings and
108108 recommendations.
109109 (g) In implementing the pilot project, the Department of
110110 State Health Services shall ensure that a parent of a child involved
111111 in the project is provided with reasonable, standardized complaint
112112 procedures for making complaints regarding the pilot project or an
113113 agency or provider involved in the pilot project.
114114 (h) The Department of State Health Services shall ensure
115115 that the pilot project:
116116 (1) is operated without regard to the race, color,
117117 disability, sex, age, national origin, or religion of the
118118 individuals involved in the pilot project; and
119119 (2) does not disproportionately target or negatively
120120 impact minorities.
121121 (i) This section does not authorize the implementation of
122122 school-based mental health screening.
123123 (j) This Act expires September 1, 2011.
124124 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
125125 ______________________________ ______________________________
126126 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
127127 I certify that H.B. No. 1232 was passed by the House on April
128128 9, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 148, Nays 0, 1 present, not
129129 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
130130 No. 1232 on May 21, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 138, Nays 2,
131131 2 present, not voting.
132132 ______________________________
133133 Chief Clerk of the House
134134 I certify that H.B. No. 1232 was passed by the Senate, with
135135 amendments, on May 18, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays
136136 1.
137137 ______________________________
138138 Secretary of the Senate
139139 APPROVED: __________________
140140 Date
141141 __________________
142142 Governor