House | 05/15/2009 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3687 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB316 | Journal Page: 3687 |
House | 05/15/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/13/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/30/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/30/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2300 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1646 | |
House | 02/26/2009 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 471 | |
House | 02/26/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 471 | |
House | 02/13/2009 | Filed |