House | 05/14/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1275 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/09/2009 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/26/2009 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 471 | |
House | 02/26/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 471 | |
House | 02/13/2009 | Filed |