1 | 1 | | 81R3337 JRJ-D |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: McClendon H.B. No. 1281 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
6 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
7 | 7 | | relating to the inclusion in the foundation curriculum for public |
---|
8 | 8 | | schools of instruction in certain skills development to prepare |
---|
9 | 9 | | students for adult responsibility. |
---|
10 | 10 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
11 | 11 | | SECTION 1. Section 28.002(a), Education Code, is amended to |
---|
12 | 12 | | read as follows: |
---|
13 | 13 | | (a) Each school district that offers kindergarten through |
---|
14 | 14 | | grade 12 shall offer, as a required curriculum: |
---|
15 | 15 | | (1) a foundation curriculum that includes: |
---|
16 | 16 | | (A) English language arts; |
---|
17 | 17 | | (B) mathematics; |
---|
18 | 18 | | (C) science; [and] |
---|
19 | 19 | | (D) social studies, consisting of Texas, United |
---|
20 | 20 | | States, and world history, government, and geography; and |
---|
21 | 21 | | (E) adult responsibility education; and |
---|
22 | 22 | | (2) an enrichment curriculum that includes: |
---|
23 | 23 | | (A) to the extent possible, languages other than |
---|
24 | 24 | | English; |
---|
25 | 25 | | (B) health, with emphasis on the importance of |
---|
26 | 26 | | proper nutrition and exercise; |
---|
27 | 27 | | (C) physical education; |
---|
28 | 28 | | (D) fine arts; |
---|
29 | 29 | | (E) economics, with emphasis on the free |
---|
30 | 30 | | enterprise system and its benefits; |
---|
31 | 31 | | (F) career and technology education; |
---|
32 | 32 | | (G) technology applications; and |
---|
33 | 33 | | (H) religious literature, including the Hebrew |
---|
34 | 34 | | Scriptures (Old Testament) and New Testament, and its impact on |
---|
35 | 35 | | history and literature. |
---|
36 | 36 | | SECTION 2. Subchapter A, Chapter 28, Education Code, is |
---|
37 | 37 | | amended by adding Section 28.0024 to read as follows: |
---|
38 | 38 | | Sec. 28.0024. ADVISORY PANEL REQUIRED TO DEVELOP CURRICULUM |
---|
39 | 39 | | FOR ADULT RESPONSIBILITY. (a) Not later than January 1, 2010, the |
---|
40 | 40 | | agency shall establish an advisory panel under this section to |
---|
41 | 41 | | develop the required foundation curriculum to teach students skills |
---|
42 | 42 | | in social, emotional, and behavioral interaction to prepare |
---|
43 | 43 | | students for adult responsibility. A primary purpose of the adult |
---|
44 | 44 | | responsibility curriculum is to teach students advanced methods of |
---|
45 | 45 | | thinking, speaking, learning, and reasoning, including methods |
---|
46 | 46 | | for: |
---|
47 | 47 | | (1) effective, nonviolent communication; |
---|
48 | 48 | | (2) problem solving; |
---|
49 | 49 | | (3) setting appropriate boundaries and priorities; |
---|
50 | 50 | | and |
---|
51 | 51 | | (4) creative decision making. |
---|
52 | 52 | | (b) The commissioner shall appoint members to the advisory |
---|
53 | 53 | | panel after consulting with the lieutenant governor, speaker of the |
---|
54 | 54 | | house of representatives, and the chairs of standing committees of |
---|
55 | 55 | | the senate and the house of representatives with primary |
---|
56 | 56 | | jurisdiction over public education. The advisory panel shall |
---|
57 | 57 | | consist of nine members as follows: |
---|
58 | 58 | | (1) three members who have professional or practical |
---|
59 | 59 | | expertise or experience in social and emotional development and |
---|
60 | 60 | | education; |
---|
61 | 61 | | (2) three members who are active educators; and |
---|
62 | 62 | | (3) three members who are business representatives or |
---|
63 | 63 | | members of the community. |
---|
64 | 64 | | (c) The appointed members of the advisory panel serve |
---|
65 | 65 | | staggered three-year terms. The commissioner shall appoint the |
---|
66 | 66 | | initial members to a three-year term. Following the initial term, |
---|
67 | 67 | | the commissioner shall appoint the members to terms of one, two, or |
---|
68 | 68 | | three years as necessary so that one-third of the appointed |
---|
69 | 69 | | advisory panel members' terms expire each year. |
---|
70 | 70 | | (d) The commissioner shall designate one member of the |
---|
71 | 71 | | advisory panel as the presiding officer. |
---|
72 | 72 | | (e) A member of the advisory panel serves on a voluntary |
---|
73 | 73 | | basis without compensation. |
---|
74 | 74 | | (f) The advisory panel may begin meeting after the |
---|
75 | 75 | | commissioner appoints at least five members to the panel. |
---|
76 | 76 | | (g) Not later than January 1, 2011, the advisory panel shall |
---|
77 | 77 | | develop the curriculum as required by this section and report to the |
---|
78 | 78 | | commissioner and the legislature as provided by this subsection. |
---|
79 | 79 | | The report must include recommendations regarding: |
---|
80 | 80 | | (1) whether the adult responsibility curriculum |
---|
81 | 81 | | should be incorporated into existing classes or provided in |
---|
82 | 82 | | separate classes before, during, or after the school day; |
---|
83 | 83 | | (2) the professional requirements for educators who |
---|
84 | 84 | | provide adult responsibility curriculum instruction; |
---|
85 | 85 | | (3) appropriate testing practices for measuring |
---|
86 | 86 | | student progress in the adult responsibility curriculum; and |
---|
87 | 87 | | (4) other considerations as determined appropriate by |
---|
88 | 88 | | the advisory panel. |
---|
89 | 89 | | (h) The commissioner shall report the recommendations |
---|
90 | 90 | | provided under Subsection (g) to the State Board of Education. |
---|
91 | 91 | | (i) Not later than September 1, 2011, the State Board of |
---|
92 | 92 | | Education by rule shall revise the essential knowledge and skills |
---|
93 | 93 | | as provided by Section 28.002(c) to include the adult |
---|
94 | 94 | | responsibility curriculum developed under this section based on the |
---|
95 | 95 | | recommendations of the advisory panel under Subsection (g). The |
---|
96 | 96 | | State Board of Education shall require school districts to provide |
---|
97 | 97 | | instruction in the adult responsibility curriculum for: |
---|
98 | 98 | | (1) kindergarten through grade five beginning with the |
---|
99 | 99 | | 2012-2013 school year; |
---|
100 | 100 | | (2) grade six through grade eight beginning with the |
---|
101 | 101 | | 2014-2015 school year; and |
---|
102 | 102 | | (3) grade nine through grade 12 beginning with the |
---|
103 | 103 | | 2016-2017 school year. |
---|
104 | 104 | | (j) The advisory panel shall deliver a biennial report to |
---|
105 | 105 | | the commissioner and the legislature that: |
---|
106 | 106 | | (1) assesses the state's progress in meeting the goals |
---|
107 | 107 | | stated in the curriculum plans developed under this section; and |
---|
108 | 108 | | (2) recommends legislative action to assist the state |
---|
109 | 109 | | in meeting those goals. |
---|
110 | 110 | | (k) This section expires September 1, 2018. |
---|
111 | 111 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
112 | 112 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
113 | 113 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
114 | 114 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
115 | 115 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|