E
|
05/20/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
05/20/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4316
|
E
|
05/13/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3680
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2317
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3436
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3680
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3172
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2210
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2210
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2210
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2210
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2210
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2210
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2210
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1935
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 1025
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1025
|
Senate
|
04/08/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 944
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1186
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#133
|
Journal Page: 1134
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1134
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1134
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1112
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1112
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1014
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2009
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2009
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2009
|
Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 473
|
House
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 473
|
House
|
02/16/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|