E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6978
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6977
|
Senate
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5153
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6895
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6975
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4475
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5659
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5660
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1469
|
Journal Page: 5659
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5659
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5215
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Reported favorably as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2617
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1932
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1932
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1303
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1719
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1645
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#220
|
Journal Page: 1644
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1644
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1644
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Postponed
|
|
Journal Page: 1613
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1613
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1581
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1581
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1581
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1014
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2009
|
Referred to Insurance
|
|
Journal Page: 473
|
House
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 473
|
House
|
02/16/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|