Senate | 05/19/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 2564 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2564 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2455 | |
House | 05/17/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3954 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3784 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Record vote | RV#922 | Journal Page: 3783 |
House | 05/15/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3783 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3783 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3672 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Record vote | RV#870 | Journal Page: 3672 |
House | 05/14/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3672 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Amended | 2-C. Turner | Journal Page: 3671 |
House | 05/14/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3671 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/05/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1149 | |
House | 04/01/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/11/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/11/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/11/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 584 | |
House | 02/26/2009 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 474 | |
House | 02/26/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 474 | |
House | 02/16/2009 | Filed |