E
|
06/19/2009
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6980
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6977
|
Senate
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5153
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6895
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 5041
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6975
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4475
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5642
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5643
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1465
|
Journal Page: 5642
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5642
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5162
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3973
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3973
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3973
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3973
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3972
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA5 Ogden
|
Journal Page: 3972
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3972
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3972
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3970
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3970
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 3524
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 3187
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 3166
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2514
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2443
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 2223
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2223
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2198
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3302
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2994
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#690
|
Journal Page: 2993
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2993
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2993
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2750
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#656
|
Journal Page: 2749
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2749
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2744
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Amendment tabled
|
14-Hancock
|
Journal Page: 2743
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Amended
|
13-Olivo
|
Journal Page: 2743
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
12-Hancock
|
Journal Page: 2743
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
6-Eissler
|
Journal Page: 2740
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Amendment amended
|
7-Villarreal
|
Journal Page: 2740
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
6-Eissler
|
Journal Page: 2739
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Amendment to amendment withdrawn
|
5-Patrick
|
Journal Page: 2739
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2738
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Postponed
|
5/7/09 2:05 PM
|
Journal Page: 2735
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2735
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2135
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2009
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 277
|
House
|
02/12/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 277
|
House
|
11/10/2008
|
Filed
|
|
|