E
|
05/27/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/27/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5217
|
E
|
05/19/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4221
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2534
|
House
|
05/19/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3970
|
House
|
05/18/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4079
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3674
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2362
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2362
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2362
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2362
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2362
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2362
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2362
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2049
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 1025
|
Senate
|
04/15/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1025
|
Senate
|
04/14/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 996
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1207
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#144
|
Journal Page: 1173
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1173
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1173
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1165
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1165
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Corrected comm. rept. sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2009
|
Corrected comm. report printed & distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2009
|
Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 989
|
House
|
03/24/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 885
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Recommendations filed with the Speaker
|
|
Journal Page: 811
|
House
|
02/26/2009
|
Referred to Urban Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 474
|
House
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 474
|
House
|
02/16/2009
|
Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|