Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1302 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 81R2027 JD-D
22 By: Frost H.B. No. 1302
33
44
55 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
66 AN ACT
77 relating to the authority of certain school districts to enter into
88 property tax abatement agreements in connection with realigned or
99 closed military facilities.
1010 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1111 SECTION 1. Section 312.002, Tax Code, is amended by
1212 amending Subsections (f) and (g) and adding Subsections (h) and (i)
1313 to read as follows:
1414 (f) Except as provided by Subsection (h), on [On] or after
1515 September 1, 2001, a school district may not enter into a tax
1616 abatement agreement under this chapter.
1717 (g) "Taxing unit" has the meaning assigned by Section 1.04[,
1818 except that for a tax abatement agreement executed on or after
1919 September 1, 2001, the term does not include a school district that
2020 is subject to Chapter 42, Education Code, and that is organized
2121 primarily to provide general elementary and secondary public
2222 education].
2323 (h) A school district has the same authority to enter into a
2424 tax abatement agreement under this chapter as a taxing unit other
2525 than a municipality or county if the property that is the subject of
2626 the proposed agreement:
2727 (1) was part of a military base or other military
2828 facility that was realigned or closed;
2929 (2) was exempt from property taxation while it was
3030 owned by the person from whom the current owner acquired it; and
3131 (3) is located in a county in the Texas-Louisiana
3232 border region as defined by Section 2056.002, Government Code.
3333 (i) Subsection (h) expires September 1, 2019. The
3434 expiration of Subsection (h) does not affect the validity of a tax
3535 abatement agreement entered into by a school district under
3636 Subsection (h) before the expiration of that subsection.
3737 SECTION 2. Section 403.302(d), Government Code, is amended
3838 to read as follows:
3939 (d) For the purposes of this section, "taxable value" means
4040 the market value of all taxable property less:
4141 (1) the total dollar amount of any residence homestead
4242 exemptions lawfully granted under Section 11.13(b) or (c), Tax
4343 Code, in the year that is the subject of the study for each school
4444 district;
4545 (2) one-half of the total dollar amount of any
4646 residence homestead exemptions granted under Section 11.13(n), Tax
4747 Code, in the year that is the subject of the study for each school
4848 district;
4949 (3) the total dollar amount of any exemption
5050 [exemptions] granted [before May 31, 1993,] within a reinvestment
5151 zone under an agreement [agreements] authorized by Chapter 312, Tax
5252 Code, if the exemption was granted:
5353 (A) before May 31, 1993; or
5454 (B) under authority of Section 312.002(h), Tax
5555 Code;
5656 (4) subject to Subsection (e), the total dollar amount
5757 of any captured appraised value of property that:
5858 (A) is within a reinvestment zone created on or
5959 before May 31, 1999, or is proposed to be included within the
6060 boundaries of a reinvestment zone as the boundaries of the zone and
6161 the proposed portion of tax increment paid into the tax increment
6262 fund by a school district are described in a written notification
6363 provided by the municipality or the board of directors of the zone
6464 to the governing bodies of the other taxing units in the manner
6565 provided by Section 311.003(e), Tax Code, before May 31, 1999, and
6666 within the boundaries of the zone as those boundaries existed on
6767 September 1, 1999, including subsequent improvements to the
6868 property regardless of when made;
6969 (B) generates taxes paid into a tax increment
7070 fund created under Chapter 311, Tax Code, under a reinvestment zone
7171 financing plan approved under Section 311.011(d), Tax Code, on or
7272 before September 1, 1999; and
7373 (C) is eligible for tax increment financing under
7474 Chapter 311, Tax Code;
7575 (5) for a school district for which a deduction from
7676 taxable value is made under Subdivision (4), an amount equal to the
7777 taxable value required to generate revenue when taxed at the school
7878 district's current tax rate in an amount that, when added to the
7979 taxes of the district paid into a tax increment fund as described by
8080 Subdivision (4)(B), is equal to the total amount of taxes the
8181 district would have paid into the tax increment fund if the district
8282 levied taxes at the rate the district levied in 2005;
8383 (6) the total dollar amount of any captured appraised
8484 value of property that:
8585 (A) is within a reinvestment zone:
8686 (i) created on or before December 31, 2008,
8787 by a municipality with a population of less than 18,000; and
8888 (ii) the project plan for which includes
8989 the alteration, remodeling, repair, or reconstruction of a
9090 structure that is included on the National Register of Historic
9191 Places and requires that a portion of the tax increment of the zone
9292 be used for the improvement or construction of related facilities
9393 or for affordable housing;
9494 (B) generates school district taxes that are paid
9595 into a tax increment fund created under Chapter 311, Tax Code; and
9696 (C) is eligible for tax increment financing under
9797 Chapter 311, Tax Code;
9898 (7) the total dollar amount of any exemptions granted
9999 under Section 11.251 or 11.253, Tax Code;
100100 (8) the difference between the comptroller's estimate
101101 of the market value and the productivity value of land that
102102 qualifies for appraisal on the basis of its productive capacity,
103103 except that the productivity value estimated by the comptroller may
104104 not exceed the fair market value of the land;
105105 (9) the portion of the appraised value of residence
106106 homesteads of individuals who receive a tax limitation under
107107 Section 11.26, Tax Code, on which school district taxes are not
108108 imposed in the year that is the subject of the study, calculated as
109109 if the residence homesteads were appraised at the full value
110110 required by law;
111111 (10) a portion of the market value of property not
112112 otherwise fully taxable by the district at market value because of:
113113 (A) action required by statute or the
114114 constitution of this state that, if the tax rate adopted by the
115115 district is applied to it, produces an amount equal to the
116116 difference between the tax that the district would have imposed on
117117 the property if the property were fully taxable at market value and
118118 the tax that the district is actually authorized to impose on the
119119 property, if this subsection does not otherwise require that
120120 portion to be deducted; or
121121 (B) action taken by the district under Subchapter
122122 B or C, Chapter 313, Tax Code;
123123 (11) the market value of all tangible personal
124124 property, other than manufactured homes, owned by a family or
125125 individual and not held or used for the production of income;
126126 (12) the appraised value of property the collection of
127127 delinquent taxes on which is deferred under Section 33.06, Tax
128128 Code;
129129 (13) the portion of the appraised value of property
130130 the collection of delinquent taxes on which is deferred under
131131 Section 33.065, Tax Code; and
132132 (14) the amount by which the market value of a
133133 residence homestead to which Section 23.23, Tax Code, applies
134134 exceeds the appraised value of that property as calculated under
135135 that section.
136136 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
137137 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
138138 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
139139 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
140140 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.