House | 05/04/2009 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2414 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 872 | Journal Page: 2411 |
House | 04/24/2009 | Postponed | 5/4/09 12:00 PM | Journal Page: 1798 |
House | 04/24/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1798 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1275 | |
House | 04/06/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Meeting cancelled | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/26/2009 | Referred to Appropriations | Journal Page: 475 | |
House | 02/26/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 475 | |
House | 02/16/2009 | Filed |