E
|
06/19/2009
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6978
|
E
|
06/01/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6976
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4986
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6027
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6903
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5204
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3573
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3573
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3573
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3573
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3573
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3573
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3572
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Removed from local & uncontested calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 3185
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Removed from local & uncontested calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 2633
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2193
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 2090
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Rereferred to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2090
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2091
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1994
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1994
|
Senate
|
04/23/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1375
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1772
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1701
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#236
|
Journal Page: 1700
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1700
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1700
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1633
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1633
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Solomons
|
Journal Page: 1632
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1632
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1124
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2009
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 475
|
House
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 475
|
House
|
02/17/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|