House
|
05/30/2009
|
Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4960
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6029
|
House
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6029
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4559
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 4559
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4522
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4522
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4522
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5914
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5914
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5914
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5204
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4051
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4051
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 4051
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 4051
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4051
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4051
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4051
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Whitmire
|
Journal Page: 4047
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4046
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 4046
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2715
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 2136
|
Senate
|
05/07/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2136
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2054
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2674
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2470
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#552
|
Journal Page: 2469
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2469
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2469
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2411
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#535
|
Journal Page: 2410
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2410
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
7-Herrero
|
Journal Page: 2408
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2408
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
6-Gutierrez
|
Journal Page: 2408
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Amended
|
5-Gutierrez
|
Journal Page: 2407
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
|
Rule 11, Section 2
|
Journal Page: 2407
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
4-Flores
|
Journal Page: 2407
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2406
|
House
|
05/02/2009
|
Postponed
|
5/4/09 10:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 2336
|
House
|
05/02/2009
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 2335
|
House
|
05/02/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2335
|
House
|
05/02/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2335
|
House
|
05/02/2009
|
Point of order overruled
|
|
Journal Page: 2333
|
House
|
05/02/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Christian
|
Journal Page: 2333
|
House
|
05/02/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2333
|
House
|
05/02/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1123
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in s/c
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2009
|
Referred to subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2009
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2009
|
Subcommittee members named
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2009
|
Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 476
|
House
|
02/26/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 476
|
House
|
02/17/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|