Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1322 Compare Versions

The same version is selected twice. Please select two different versions to compare.
OldNewDifferences
11 H.B. No. 1322
22
33
44 AN ACT
55 relating to the establishment of an online resource for teachers of
66 students with special health needs.
77 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
88 SECTION 1. Subchapter J, Chapter 21, Education Code, is
99 amended by adding Section 21.463 to read as follows:
1010 Sec. 21.463. RESOURCES FOR TEACHERS OF STUDENTS WITH
1111 SPECIAL HEALTH NEEDS. The agency, in coordination with the Health
1212 and Human Services Commission, shall establish and maintain an
1313 Internet website to provide resources for teachers who teach
1414 students with special health needs. The agency shall include on the
1515 website information about:
1616 (1) the treatment and management of chronic illnesses
1717 and how such illnesses impact a student's well-being or ability to
1818 succeed in school; and
1919 (2) food allergies that are common among students,
2020 including information about preventing exposure to a specific food
2121 when necessary to protect a student's health and information about
2222 treating a student suffering from an allergic reaction to a food.
2323 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
2424 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
2525 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
2626 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
2727 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
2828 ______________________________ ______________________________
2929 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
3030 I certify that H.B. No. 1322 was passed by the House on April
3131 24, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 137, Nays 0, 1 present, not
3232 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
3333 H.B. No. 1322 on May 29, 2009, and requested the appointment of a
3434 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
3535 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
3636 on H.B. No. 1322 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 146,
3737 Nays 0, 1 present, not voting.
3838 ______________________________
3939 Chief Clerk of the House
4040 I certify that H.B. No. 1322 was passed by the Senate, with
4141 amendments, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
4242 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
4343 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
4444 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
4545 1322 on June 1, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
4646 ______________________________
4747 Secretary of the Senate
4848 APPROVED: __________________
4949 Date
5050 __________________
5151 Governor