E | 06/19/2009 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/19/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6978 | |
E | 05/29/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6040 | |
Senate | 05/28/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 4137 | |
House | 05/28/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5197 | |
House | 05/28/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 5986 | |
House | 05/27/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 5126 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3500 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3500 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 3500 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 3500 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3500 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3500 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 3500 | |
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/27/2009 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2725 | |
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/20/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2614 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Referred to International Relations and Trade | Journal Page: 2564 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2564 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2455 | |
House | 05/17/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3954 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Record vote | RV#894 | Journal Page: 3754 |
House | 05/15/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3754 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3754 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3531 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3531 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Postponed | 5/14/09 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 3167 |
House | 05/11/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3167 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 2594 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1771 | |
House | 04/15/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/26/2009 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 476 | |
House | 02/26/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 476 | |
House | 02/17/2009 | Filed |