Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB1343 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.B. No. 1343


 AN ACT
 relating to blind and disabled pedestrians and failure of the
 operator of a motor vehicle to yield the right-of-way.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 121.007, Human Resources Code, is
 transferred to Chapter 552, Transportation Code, renumbered as
 Section 552.010, and amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 552.010 [121.007]. BLIND [AND DISABLED] PEDESTRIANS.
 (a) No person may carry a white cane on a public street or highway
 unless the person is totally or partially blind.
 (b) The driver of a vehicle approaching an intersection or
 crosswalk where a pedestrian guided by an assistance animal or
 carrying a white cane is crossing or attempting to cross shall take
 necessary precautions to avoid injuring or endangering the
 pedestrian. The driver shall bring the vehicle to a full stop if
 injury or danger can be avoided only by that action.
 (c) If it is shown on the trial of an offense under this
 section that as a result of the commission of the offense a
 collision occurred causing serious bodily injury or death to a
 blind person, the offense is a misdemeanor punishable by:
 (1) a fine of not more than $500; and
 (2)  30 hours of community service to an organization
 or agency that primarily serves visually impaired or disabled
 persons, to be completed in not less than six months and not more
 than one year.
 (c-1)  A portion of the community service required under
 Subsection (c)(2) shall include sensitivity training. [The failure
 of a totally or partially blind or otherwise disabled person to
 carry a white cane or be guided or aided by an assistance animal
 does not deprive the person of the rights and privileges conferred
 by law on pedestrians crossing streets or highways and does not
 constitute evidence of contributory negligence.]
 (d) For the purposes of this section:
 (1)  "Assistance animal" has the meaning assigned by
 Section 121.002, Human Resources Code.
 (2)  "White cane" has the meaning assigned by Section
 121.002, Human Resources Code [A person who violates this section
 commits a Class C misdemeanor].
 (e)  If conduct constituting an offense under this section
 also constitutes an offense under another section of this code or
 the Penal Code, the actor may be prosecuted under either section or
 both sections.
 SECTION 2. Section 552.003, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsections (d), (d-1), (e), and (f) to read as follows:
 (d)  If it is shown on the trial of an offense under
 Subsection (a) that as a result of the commission of the offense a
 collision occurred causing serious bodily injury or death to a
 visually impaired or disabled person, the offense is a misdemeanor
 punishable by:
 (1) a fine of not more than $500; and
 (2)  30 hours of community service to an organization
 or agency that primarily serves visually impaired or disabled
 persons, to be completed in not less than six months and not more
 than one year.
 (d-1)  A portion of the community service required under
 Subsection (d)(2) shall include sensitivity training.
 (e) For the purposes of this section:
 (1)  "Visually impaired" has the meaning assigned by
 Section 91.002, Human Resources Code.
 (2)  "Disabled" means a person who cannot walk without
 the use or assistance of:
 (A)  a device, including a brace, cane, crutch,
 prosthesis, or wheelchair; or
 (B) another person.
 (f)  If conduct constituting an offense under this section
 also constitutes an offense under another section of this code or
 the Penal Code, the actor may be prosecuted under either section or
 both sections.
 SECTION 3. (a) The change in law made by this Act applies
 only to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this
 Act. For purposes of this section, an offense is committed before
 the effective date of this Act if any element of the offense occurs
 before that date.
 (b) An offense committed before the effective date of this
 Act is covered by the law in effect when the offense was committed,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1343 was passed by the House on May
 15, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 1343 on May 29, 2009, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 1343 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 145,
 Nays 0, 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1343 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays
 1; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 1343 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor