E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6978
|
E
|
05/31/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6976
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4680
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5976
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6039
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5126
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3500
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3500
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3500
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3500
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3500
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3500
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3500
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2758
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 2092
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2092
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1949
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2337
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2222
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#439
|
Journal Page: 2221
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2221
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2221
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2202
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2202
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2202
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Postponed
|
4/30/09 10:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 2119
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2119
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1123
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2009
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2009
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2009
|
Subcommittee members named
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2009
|
Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2009
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 489
|
House
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 489
|
House
|
02/17/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|